Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 864 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1938 Week
» 27299 Month
» 260219 Year
» 1925595 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1256 m/e 07/1892
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7822 m/e 10/1926
British Railways 58932 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Coal Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3319
Fittings (as built)
Boiler Diagram Precursor
Safety Valves Ramsbottom
To Service During 07/1892
Withdrawal During 06/1952
Service Life 59 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1892
8A   Edge Hill w/e 18/09/1948
7D   Rhyl 4w/e 09/09/1950
10E   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) m/e 30/11/1950
10E   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 02/12/1950
3E   Monument Lane 4w/e 01/12/1951
4A   Bletchley 4w/e 26/01/1952
3E   Monument Lane 4w/e 19/04/1952
     Withdrawn m/e 06/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 7B Bangor m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 18/09/1948
ALLOC 7D Rhyl w/e 09/09/1950
EXLOAN 8A Edge Hill w/e 16/09/1950
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 3E Monument Lane 4w/e 01/12/1951
LOAN 4A Bletchley 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 3E Monument Lane 4w/e 19/04/1952
WDN   w/e 14/06/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1947 Push and Pull Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1948 North Wales Bangor shed received on 6/9 two new Class '2P' 2-6-2T's, Nos. 41212 an 41213 . Both are in the new black livery, lined out in red, straw and grey, the numbers being on the tank sides below the cab window and not on the coal bunker as on the earlier examples of the Class. Both locomotives are fitted for 'push and pull' working, and are to work on the Amlwch and Bethseda branches. No. 41213 made her first trip on the Amlwch branch on 9/9 when she worked the 3.55 p.m. from Bangor. In spite of spending nearly ten minutes at Llangefni disposing of a loaded cattle truck and a large number of parcels and luggage, the arrival at Amlwch was only 6 minutes late. A small crowd of interested railwaymen and others witnessed her departure from Bangor. Until the arrival of these two new 2-6-2T's, traffic on the Amlwch branch has been shared between 2-6-2T No. 1200 and Webb 2-4-2T No. 46687. The latter, although so aged, puts up a good performance on the branch and was noted touching 60 m.p.h. between Gaerwen and Menai Bridge when working the 10.45 a.m. from Amlwch on 9/9. The thrice-weekly goods train on the Holland Arms-Red Wharf Bay branch is worked by either 'Cauliflower' No. 28553 or one of the two tank versions of the Class stationed at Bangor-Nos. 6899 an 6906. Trains from Bangor to Afon Wen are shortly to be worked through to Pwllheli by ex L.M.S. engines and on this account most of the 2-6-4T's at present shedded at Bangor for this duty are to be transferred else-where, since they are not suitable for working over the old Cambrian section of the former G.W.R. They are to be replaced by Stanier 2-6-2T's which will augment the few already there which include Nos. 72 an 124. 2-6-4T's at present shedded at Bangor include Nos. 2258, 2259, 2260, 2261 an 2628. Bangor's rapidly dwindling band of Webb 'coal tanks' include Nos. 7730, 7765 an 7822. Three ex L. & Y. 0-6-0's, Nos. 12119, 12176 an 12407, are also at Bangor for short distance goods haulage. SLS/194811
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LMS) Engines running with L.M.S. Numbers. (March 1952) 407, 493, 682, 1324, 1370, 2093, 2994/8, 3062, 3253, 3301/32, 3436, 3514, 3622/62, 3731/49, 3820, 4245, 4436, 6899, 7112/28/29/91, 7377/81, 7407/19/23/96, 7625, 7752, 7822, 8278, 8310, 8510, 8602, 8745, 8921/51, 9010/61, 9108/16/29/99, 9265/70/75/77, 9330/85, 9417, 10725/35, 10807/92, 11537, 12123, 12203/69/93, 16039, 22900/65, 28107/28, 28251, 28312, 28580/3/9. In works: 7597, 4003. Uncertain: 609, 2994 (? done and not advised). SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1892 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1256
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3319
   
10/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 7822    
11/1947 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 58932 but not taken up    
18/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (7D)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E)    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E)    
01/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (4A)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E)    
06/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 7822    

prev prev