Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1532 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19335 Week
» 72351 Month
» 191878 Year
» 3218731 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2350 |
m/e |
02/1897 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
7833 |
m/e |
09/1928 |
British Railways |
58935 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
Coal Tank |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3696 |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram Precursor | Safety Valves | Ramsbottom |
|
To Service |
During 02/1897 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1951 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1897 |
4E |
|
Tredegar |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
4D |
|
Abergavenny |
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
10/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
19/07/1947 |
ALLOC |
4E |
Tredegar |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
ALLOC |
4D |
Abergavenny |
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
06/10/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1925 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1897 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2350 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3696 |
|
|
08/1925 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
09/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7833 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 58935 but not taken up |
|
|
12/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tredegar (4E) |
|
|
19/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abergavenny (4D) |
|
|
10/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7833 |
|
|