Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 536 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24167 Week
» 89121 Month
» 291785 Year
» 3318638 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2532 |
m/e |
02/1895 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9029 |
m/e |
10/1927 |
British Railways |
49029 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
A Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
3552 |
To Service |
During 02/1895 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 13/05/1950 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
13/05/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1945 |
Belle Vue MPD |
Locos seen during October included: 1097 22B, 3173 20G, 6272 22A, 5303 8A, 5364 12A, 5590 22A, 8908 5B, 9029 10A, 12336 23E, 12562 24D, 12857 23B, 12861 23B. 8037 18A was noted on a troop train on 4/10. |
SLS/194601 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1895 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2532 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3552 |
|
|
10/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9029 |
|
|
30/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49029 |
|
|
13/05/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49029 |
|
|