Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 790 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6717 Week
» 5455 Month
» 419776 Year
» 1641341 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2537 m/e 08/1896
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9019 m/e 06/1927
British Railways 49019 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class A Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
A08/1896
D04/1907
G106/1925
G2A05/1940
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3662
To Service During 08/1896
Withdrawal During 06/1949
Service Life 52 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1896
4D Abergavenny on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 4D Abergavenny w/e 15/11/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/10/1945 Swansea Paxton Street MPD Home engines on shed on 17/10 were: 1676, 2360/81/90, 7715/41, 7807, 7931/3/41, 8325/44/5, 8673/89/91, 9033, 9260, 9358, 27621, 28543, 28622. Other locos were 2307, 5245, 5318, 8324, 8688, 9019 of 4A and 7258 of 4C. SLS/194601
16/05/1948 Abergavenny MPD At Abergavenny both Nos. 1202/3 were on shed and No. 9019 worked the 5.5 p.m. to Merthyr. No. 27654 was banking freight trains up to Llanvihangel and other coal tanks at work were Nos. 7808, 7782 an 7816. No. 1204 was at Tredegar but was being sent to Abergavenny for washout during the weekend and No. 1203 was sent to replace it. The 7.52 p.m. from Tredegar to Newport was worked by No. 9409. It is of interest to note that some of the highest points reached by the railways in Britain are on the Abergavenny-Merthyr line, and its branches, and it is no small tribute to the L.N.W.R. locomotives concerned that they are still entrusted with most of the trains over tne severe gradients encountered SLS/194807

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1896 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2537
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3662
   
06/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9019    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Abergavenny (4D)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 49019 but not taken up    
06/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 9019    

prev prev