Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 708 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6635 Week
» 5373 Month
» 419694 Year
» 1641259 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2541 m/e 08/1896
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8953 m/e 10/1923
British Railways 48953 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class A Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
A08/1896
C11/1904
G112/1926
G2A12/1939
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3666
To Service During 08/1896
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/10/1961
Service Life 65 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1896
1A Willesden on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2D Nuneaton 5w/e 16/07/1949
3A Bescot 4w/e 02/12/1950
4A Bletchley 4w/e 24/02/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 07/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2D Nuneaton w/e 09/07/1949
ALLOC 2B Bletchley w/e 15/10/1949
LOAN 3A Bescot m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 4A Bletchley m/e 28/02/1951
WDN   w/e 07/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1896 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2541
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3666
   
10/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 8953    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 48953    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D)    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (3A)    
24/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (4A)    
07/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 48953    

prev prev