Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1833 m/e 07/1898
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9009 m/e 07/1928
British Railways 49009 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class A Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
A07/1898
D10/1906
G1 (0-8-0)07/1937
G2A (0-8-0)06/1940
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3838
To Service During 07/1898
Withdrawal w/e Sat 28/11/1959
Service Life 61 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1898
9D   Buxton (LNWR) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10D   Plodder Lane w/e 17/01/1948
6B   Mold Junction w/e 31/12/1949
6B   Mold Junction 3w/e 14/01/1950
3A   Bescot w/e 04/02/1950
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 06/11/1954
3A   Bescot 4w/e 04/12/1954
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 21/02/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 28/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10D Plodder Lane w/e 17/01/1948
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 3A Bescot w/e 04/02/1950
LOAN 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 27/11/1954
ALLOC 3A Bescot 4w/e 27/11/1954
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 28/02/1959
WDN   w/e 28/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1898 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1833
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3838
   
07/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 9009    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
17/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Plodder Lane (10D)    
31/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
14/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
04/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (3A)    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 49009    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (3A)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
28/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 49009    

prev prev