Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 288 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1989 Week
» 10104 Month
» 137547 Year
» 1802923 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1866 m/e 05/1899
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9002 m/e 10/1923
British Railways 49002 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class A Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
A05/1899
D03/1906
G1 (0-8-0)12/1932
G2A (0-8-0)12/1939
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3903
To Service During 05/1899
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/09/1962
Service Life 63 yrs, 4 mths , 16 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1899
9A   Longsight on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 18/03/1950
2B   Nuneaton w/e 14/04/1951
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 19/05/1951
8A   Edge Hill w/e 28/01/1961
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 09/09/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 15/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 18/03/1950
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton w/e 14/04/1951
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 30/09/1961
WDN   w/e 15/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1899 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1866
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3903
   
10/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 9002    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 49002    
18/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
14/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
09/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
15/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 49002    

prev prev