Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1822 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19625 Week
» 72641 Month
» 192168 Year
» 3219021 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1882 |
m/e |
09/1901 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9344 |
m/e |
09/1927 |
British Railways |
49344 |
m/e |
07/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4156 |
To Service |
During 09/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/12/1962 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 3 mths , 0 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1901 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1882 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4156 |
|
|
09/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9344 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Watford (1C) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
07/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49344 |
|
|
28/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49344 |
|
|