Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 773 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6700 Week
» 5438 Month
» 419759 Year
» 1641324 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1889 m/e 09/1901
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9345 m/e 12/1927
British Railways 49345 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B09/1901
E08/1906
G106/1920
G2A03/1942
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4163
To Service During 09/1901
Withdrawal Fri 31/01/1958
Service Life 56 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1901
2D Nuneaton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 04/12/1954
   Withdrawn m/e 31/01/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 4D Abergavenny w/e 15/10/1949
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 04/12/1954
WDN   m/e 31/01/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1901 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1889
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4163
   
12/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9345    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D)    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 49345    
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
31/01/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 49345    

prev prev