Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 816 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18619 Week
» 71635 Month
» 191162 Year
» 3218015 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1890 |
m/e |
09/1901 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8901 |
m/e |
11/1926 |
British Railways |
48901 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4164 |
To Service |
During 09/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/05/1952 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1901 |
2A |
|
Rugby |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
4A |
|
Shrewsbury |
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
17/05/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
EXLOAN |
2A |
Rugby |
w/e |
24/05/1947 |
ALLOC |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/05/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1901 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1890 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4164 |
|
|
11/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8901 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48901 |
|
|
25/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48901 |
|
|