Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 800 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14206 Week
» 67222 Month
» 186749 Year
» 3213602 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2564 |
m/e |
08/1902 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8917 |
m/e |
11/1926 |
British Railways |
48917 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4263 |
To Service |
During 08/1902 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 09/11/1957 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1902 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2564 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4263 |
|
|
11/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8917 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48917 |
|
|
13/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
09/11/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48917 |
|
|