Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 31 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4658 Week
» 6396 Month
» 133839 Year
» 1799215 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1228 m/e 01/1903
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9142 m/e 12/1926
British Railways 49142 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B01/1903
G10/1910
G1 (0-8-0)06/1923
G2A (0-8-0)09/1945
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4309
To Service During 01/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/12/1962
Service Life 59 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1903
3A   Bescot on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 07/07/1951
9B   Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 17/07/1951
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 21/02/1953
8A   Edge Hill w/e 28/01/1961
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 11/04/1961
8A   Edge Hill w/e 17/06/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 22/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 01/04/1961
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 21B Bescot 4w/e 03/11/1962
WDN   w/e 22/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1903 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1228
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4309
   
12/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9142    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 49142    
07/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
17/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
11/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
22/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 49142    

prev prev