Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 32 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4659 Week
» 6397 Month
» 133840 Year
» 1799216 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1243 m/e 04/1903
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9150 m/e 02/1927
British Railways 49150 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B04/1903
G02/1915
G1 (0-8-0)08/1934
G2A (0-8-0)06/1939
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4319
To Service During 04/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/11/1959
Service Life 56 yrs, 7 mths , 14 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1903
2D   Nuneaton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10B   Preston w/e 22/01/1949
8D   Widnes 4w/e 04/10/1958
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 08/11/1958
     Withdrawn w/e 14/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10B Preston w/e 22/01/1949
ALLOC 8D Widnes 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 29/11/1958
WDN   w/e 14/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1903 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1243
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4319
   
02/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9150    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49150    
22/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (10B)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
08/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
14/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 49150    

prev prev