Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2558 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15964 Week
» 68980 Month
» 188507 Year
» 3215360 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1279 |
m/e |
07/1903 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9352 |
m/e |
05/1927 |
British Railways |
49352 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4350 |
To Service |
During 07/1903 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 15/09/1962 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 2 mths , 16 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1903 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1279 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4350 |
|
|
05/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9352 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49352 |
|
|
15/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
11/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
01/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
04/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
11/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49352 |
|
|