Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1279 m/e 07/1903
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9352 m/e 05/1927
British Railways 49352 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B07/1903
G1 (0-8-0)02/1921
G2A (0-8-0)03/1940
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4350
To Service During 07/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/09/1962
Service Life 59 yrs, 2 mths , 16 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1903
2D   Nuneaton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 15/01/1949
8G   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 11/04/1959
9D   Buxton (LNWR) w/e 17/09/1960
8A   Edge Hill w/e 01/10/1960
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 04/03/1961
8A   Edge Hill w/e 11/04/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 15/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 15/01/1949
ALLOC 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 5w/e 02/05/1959
ALLOC 9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 5w/e 29/10/1960
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 04/03/1961
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 01/04/1961
WDN   w/e 15/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1903 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1279
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4350
   
05/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9352    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49352    
15/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
11/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
01/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
04/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
11/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
15/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 49352    

prev prev