Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 33 Today
» 1062 Yesterday
» 4798 Week
» 3536 Month
» 417857 Year
» 1639422 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1289 m/e 09/1903
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9361 m/e 08/1923
British Railways 49361 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B09/1903
G106/1921
G2A09/1938
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4361
To Service During 09/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 26/12/1964
Scrapping Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 61 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1903
3A Bescot on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
21C Bushbury w/e 10/11/1962
21B Bescot w/e 22/12/1962
5B Crewe South w/e 28/12/1963
2F Bescot w/e 22/02/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 26/12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 21C Bushbury 4w/e 01/12/1962
ALLOC 21B Bescot 4w/e 29/12/1962
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 2F Bescot 5w/e 07/03/1964
WDN   w/e 26/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
26/11/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D10, D132-4, 44695, 45101/90, 45200, 45617/74, 45702, 48605, 49395, 78042. Paint Shop Yard: D135, 42213, 44697, 44757, 45608, 45710, 46130, 48252, 48476, 50850, 70048. New Erecting Shop: D1/3/9, D136/7, D214/31, D5140. Erecting Shop: D50-8, D290, 41251, 42148, 42224/55, 42440, 42571, 42679, 44690, 44942-4/89, 45046/92, 45145, 45256/90, 45301/37/86, 45424/93, 45543/52, 45695, 45709, 46133, 46224/53, 46506, 48130, 48399, 48408/45, 48532, 48638/49, 48700/3/36/62, 49130, 49361, 70042, 90188, 90365, 92017/76/82, 92125. Erecting Shop Yard: 42287/94, 44765, 44965, 45186/97, 45719, 46141. Minor Repair Road: 44753, 45646, 92025. Works Sidings: 44746/81, 44887, 45026/42, 45680, 46109, 47255, 47403/5, 48215, 48500/28/51, 78035, 90675, 92016/8, 92163. Scrap Road: 42545, 45401 just cut up, 45630 being cut up, 40033/4/8/64, 40569, 42217, 42467, 42549, 42683, 48927, 49401/53 intact. Works Shunters: 13292, 44374, 51412/46, 47592, 47608/61, 52093, 52218, 52441/59. SLS/196201
18/12/1963 Bescot MPD 49361 an 49407 went light to Crewe South on 18th December, where they are to be fitted with snow-ploughs and kept available in steam for snow-plough duties if required. As 49173 is awaiting spares, this leaves only two Super Ds for four rostered jobs and thus Class 4Fs have been used (ex-store), although 48895 is often borrowed from Bushbury. SLS/196401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1903 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1289
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4361
   
08/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 9361    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 49361    
10/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bushbury (21C)    
22/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (21B)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
22/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (2F)    
26/12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 49361    

prev prev