Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 2855 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16261 Week
» 69277 Month
» 188804 Year
» 3215657 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1401 |
m/e |
10/1903 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9075 |
m/e |
12/1927 |
British Railways |
49075 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4372 |
To Service |
During 10/1903 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 28/01/1950 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 3 mths , 29 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
3B |
Bushbury |
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
28/01/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1903 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1401 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4372 |
|
|
12/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9075 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49075 |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
28/01/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49075 |
|
|