Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1438 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19241 Week
» 72257 Month
» 191784 Year
» 3218637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1586 |
m/e |
01/1904 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9353 |
m/e |
03/1927 |
British Railways |
49353 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4389 |
To Service |
During 01/1904 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1949 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
ALLOC |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
24/12/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1904 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1586 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4389 |
|
|
03/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9353 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
18/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 49353 but not taken up |
|
|
12/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9353 |
|
|