Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 37 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4664 Week
» 6402 Month
» 133845 Year
» 1799221 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2656 m/e 02/1910
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9079 m/e 10/1928
British Railways 49080 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Whale
Class 2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
G02/1910
G1 (0-8-0)02/1926
G2A (0-8-0)11/1939
Wheels 0-8-0
Works Number 4893
To Service During 02/1910
Withdrawal During 02/1950
Service Life 40 yrs

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1910
8D   Widnes on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn m/e 02/1950
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 08/11/1958
2B   Nuneaton w/e 07/11/1959
21B   Bescot w/e 05/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1910 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2656    
10/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 9079    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Widnes (8D)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 49080 but not taken up    
02/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 9079    
08/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
05/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (21B)    

prev prev