Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 328 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18131 Week
» 71147 Month
» 190674 Year
» 3217527 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1354 |
m/e |
03/1910 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9082 |
m/e |
09/1928 |
British Railways |
49082 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Whale |
Class |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4900 |
To Service |
During 03/1910 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 15/10/1960 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
5C |
Stafford |
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
EXLOAN |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
ALLOC |
2B |
Bletchley |
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
LOAN |
3A |
Bescot |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
ALLOC |
4A |
Bletchley |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
ALLOC |
1A |
Willesden |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
16/11/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1910 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1354 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4900 |
|
|
09/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9082 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49082 |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
04/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
26/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (4A) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
14/07/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (85C) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tredegar (86K) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
15/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
28/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
15/10/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49082 |
|
|