Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 90 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17893 Week
» 70909 Month
» 190436 Year
» 3217289 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1456 |
m/e |
03/1910 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9092 |
m/e |
05/1927 |
British Railways |
49092 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Whale |
Class |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4903 |
To Service |
During 03/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 27/09/1952 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 6 mths , 29 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1910 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1456 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4903 |
|
|
05/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9092 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49092 |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
18/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
19/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
03/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
27/09/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49092 |
|
|