Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 4730 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20342 Week
» 118987 Month
» 321651 Year
» 3348504 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1647 |
m/e |
05/1910 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9106 |
m/e |
12/1927 |
British Railways |
49106 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Whale |
Class |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4916 |
To Service |
During 05/1910 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 15/12/1962 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 7 mths , 15 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1910 |
3A |
|
Bescot |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
2D |
|
Nuneaton |
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
3B |
|
Bushbury |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
3A |
|
Bescot |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
1E |
|
Bletchley |
w/e |
27/01/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
15/12/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2D |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1910 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1647 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4916 |
|
|
12/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9106 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A) |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49106 |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
27/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49106 |
|
|