Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4199 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17605 Week
» 70621 Month
» 190148 Year
» 3217001 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1699 |
m/e |
05/1910 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9109 |
m/e |
06/1926 |
British Railways |
49109 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Whale |
Class |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4919 |
To Service |
During 05/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 07/03/1959 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 10 mths , 5 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1910 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1699 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4919 |
|
|
06/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9109 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49109 |
|
|
21/04/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
23/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49109 |
|
|