Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 486 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3412 Week
» 5150 Month
» 132593 Year
» 1797969 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1609 m/e 06/1910
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9112 m/e 01/1928
British Railways 49113 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Whale
Class 2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
G06/1910
G1 (0-8-0)01/1928
G2A (0-8-0)10/1939
Wheels 0-8-0
Works Number 4922
To Service During 06/1910
Withdrawal Mon 19/01/1959
Service Life 48 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1910
6B   Mold Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
11A   Carnforth 5w/e 16/07/1949
8C   Speke Junction 4w/e 23/02/1952
8B   Warrington Dallam 4w/e 12/07/1952
2B   Nuneaton 8w/e 29/11/1952
     Withdrawn on 19/01/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 80G   4w/e 08/10/1955
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
WDN   m/e 31/01/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/05/1958 Pontypool Road MPD 58926 is now stored outside (with 49113). SLS/195807
06/03/1959 Over and Wharton branch One track of this short branch from Acton Bridge contains the LTS locos. shown as transferred to Spital Bridge (Peterboro') on 6th March 'condemned' in official lists viz. 41928/39/41/5/6/8/50/77/8/81-7/90-3, also ex LNWR 0-8-0s 48945, 49109/13/17/57/80, 49226/330/68. Another LTS loco, is at Badnall Wharf (between Norton Bridge and Standon Bridge) viz. 41936 along with 41078/156/724, 43419/631, 50646/725/57/77/818/31/55/65, 51424/53, 52399/517, 58066/196. SLS/195904

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1910 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1609    
01/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 9112    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Mold Junction (6B)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49113    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (11A)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
19/01/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 49113    

prev prev