Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 807 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18610 Week
» 71626 Month
» 191153 Year
» 3218006 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1637 |
m/e |
06/1910 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9114 |
m/e |
09/1928 |
British Railways |
49114 |
m/e |
04/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Whale |
Class |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4924 |
To Service |
During 06/1910 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/12/1962 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 6 mths , 0 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
5C |
Stafford |
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1910 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1637 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4924 |
|
|
09/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9114 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
04/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49114 |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
18/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49114 |
|
|