Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1772 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19575 Week
» 72591 Month
» 192118 Year
» 3218971 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1774 |
m/e |
08/1910 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9130 |
m/e |
05/1928 |
British Railways |
49130 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Whale |
Class |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4938 |
To Service |
During 08/1910 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/12/1962 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 4 mths , 0 dys |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1910 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1774 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4938 |
|
|
05/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9130 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49130 |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
03/01/1959 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
03/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49130 |
|
|