Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 30 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4657 Week
» 6395 Month
» 133838 Year
» 1799214 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1403 m/e 08/1910
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9134 m/e 07/1926
British Railways 49135 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Whale
Class 2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
G08/1910
G1 (0-8-0)12/1937
Wheels 0-8-0
Works Number 4940
To Service During 08/1910
Withdrawal During 11/1949
Service Life 39 yrs , 3 mths

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1910
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10B   Preston w/e 24/04/1948
     Withdrawn m/e 11/1949
TESTS   (CME, Crewe) 4w/e 17/07/1951
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 15/08/1959
2B   Nuneaton w/e 07/11/1959
24K   Preston w/e 28/01/1961
24C   Lostock Hall w/e 16/09/1961
26F   Patricroft w/e 23/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10B Preston w/e 24/04/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1910 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1403    
07/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9134    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
24/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (10B)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 49135 but not taken up    
11/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 9134    
17/07/1951 Allocation      
15/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (24K)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
23/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (26F)    

prev prev