Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 3357 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16763 Week
» 69779 Month
» 189306 Year
» 3216159 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1424 |
m/e |
08/1910 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9135 |
m/e |
11/1927 |
British Railways |
49135 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Whale |
Class |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4941 |
To Service |
During 08/1910 |
Withdrawal |
During 11/1949 |
Service Life |
39 yrs , 3 mths |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1910 |
2F |
|
Coventry |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
2A |
|
Rugby |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
3C |
|
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
11/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
ALLOC |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1910 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1424 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4941 |
|
|
11/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9135 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Coventry (2F) |
|
|
21/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 49135 but not taken up |
|
|
04/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9135 |
|
|