Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 2854 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16260 Week
» 69276 Month
» 188803 Year
» 3215656 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1735 |
m/e |
09/1910 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9139 |
m/e |
09/1928 |
British Railways |
49139 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Whale |
Class |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4945 |
To Service |
During 09/1910 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 15/09/1962 |
Service Life |
52 yrs , 15 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1910 |
1A |
|
Willesden |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
CMECrewe |
|
|
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
8F |
|
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
4w/e |
19/04/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CMECrewe |
|
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/09/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1910 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1735 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4945 |
|
|
09/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9139 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49139 |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
19/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49139 |
|
|