Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 65 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2991 Week
» 4729 Month
» 132172 Year
» 1797548 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2014 m/e 09/1910
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9144 m/e 11/1927
British Railways 49154 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Whale
Class 2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
G09/1910
G1 (0-8-0)03/1926
G2A (0-8-0)10/1944
Wheels 0-8-0
Works Number 4949
To Service During 09/1910
Withdrawal w/e Sat 01/12/1962
Service Life 52 yrs, 3 mths , 0 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1910
5C   Stafford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2B   Bletchley w/e 05/06/1948
11A   Carnforth 4w/e 27/01/1951
9G   Northwich w/e 18/08/1951
4A   Bletchley w/e 01/09/1951
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 15/09/1951
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 09/10/1954
2B   Nuneaton 8w/e 05/10/1957
9A   Longsight 4w/e 28/12/1957
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 25/01/1958
8A   Edge Hill w/e 30/01/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 01/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2B Bletchley w/e 05/06/1948
ALLOC 9G Northwich w/e 18/08/1951
ALLOC 4A Bletchley w/e 01/09/1951
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 15/09/1951
WDN   w/e 01/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1910 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2014    
11/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9144    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stafford (5C)    
05/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (2B)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49154    
27/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (11A)    
18/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (9G)    
01/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (4A)    
15/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
28/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
01/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 49154    

prev prev