Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3644 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17050 Week
» 70066 Month
» 189593 Year
» 3216446 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
742 |
m/e |
11/1921 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9396 |
m/e |
04/1927 |
British Railways |
49396 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 11/1921 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/11/1959 |
Service Life |
38 yrs , 7 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
1A |
Willesden |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
ALLOC |
2B |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
26/08/1950 |
ALLOC |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
23/09/1950 |
ALLOC |
10B |
Preston |
w/e |
25/08/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1921 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 742 |
|
|
04/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9396 |
|
|
30/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2C) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
24/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
26/08/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49396 |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
23/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
25/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49396 |
|
|