Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3856 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22767 Week
» 87721 Month
» 290385 Year
» 3317238 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
216 |
m/e |
11/1921 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9398 |
m/e |
08/1927 |
British Railways |
49398 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 11/1921 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/11/1959 |
Service Life |
38 yrs , 7 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
1A |
Willesden |
w/e |
11/10/1947 |
EXLOAN |
2A |
Rugby |
w/e |
10/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1921 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 216 |
|
|
08/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9398 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49398 |
|
|
28/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49398 |
|
|