Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1743 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19546 Week
» 72562 Month
» 192089 Year
» 3218942 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
369 |
m/e |
01/1922 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9406 |
m/e |
12/1926 |
British Railways |
49406 |
w/e |
23/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 01/1922 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 15/06/1963 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 5 mths , 15 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1922 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 369 |
|
|
12/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9406 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
10/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abergavenny (4D) |
|
|
23/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49406 |
|
|
27/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
15/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
24/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (21B) |
|
|
15/06/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49406 |
|
|