Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1612 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19415 Week
» 72431 Month
» 191958 Year
» 3218811 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
567 |
m/e |
01/1922 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9415 |
m/e |
07/1926 |
British Railways |
49415 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 01/1922 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/12/1962 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 11 mths , 0 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1922 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 567 |
|
|
07/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9415 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
24/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
19/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49415 |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Coventry (2D) |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
28/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49415 |
|
|