Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 843 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18646 Week
» 71662 Month
» 191189 Year
» 3218042 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
134 |
m/e |
07/1922 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9425 |
m/e |
08/1927 |
British Railways |
49425 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 07/1922 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 15/09/1962 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 2 mths , 16 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
2D |
Coventry |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
ALLOC |
2B |
Nuneaton |
4w/e |
29/11/1958 |
ALLOC |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
5w/e |
05/05/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1922 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 134 |
|
|
08/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9425 |
|
|
11/04/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49425 |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Coventry (2D) |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49425 |
|
|