Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 588 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3514 Week
» 5252 Month
» 132695 Year
» 1798071 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2050 m/e 07/1922
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9428 m/e 11/1926
British Railways 49428 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Beames
Class G2
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
To Service During 07/1922
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/12/1962
Service Life 40 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1922
2D   Nuneaton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9A   Longsight w/e 21/05/1949
24L   Carnforth w/e 18/04/1959
8G   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 16/01/1960
24L   Carnforth w/e 10/09/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 08/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 9A Longsight w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 5w/e 02/05/1959
ALLOC 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 4w/e 24/09/1960
WDN   w/e 08/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1922 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2050    
11/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9428    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 49428    
21/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
18/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
16/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
08/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 49428    

prev prev