Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2299 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15705 Week
» 68721 Month
» 188248 Year
» 3215101 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2226 |
m/e |
07/1922 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9430 |
m/e |
03/1927 |
British Railways |
49430 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 07/1922 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 26/12/1964 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2C |
Northampton |
w/e |
13/05/1950 |
ALLOC |
2B |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
25/08/1951 |
LOAN |
5C |
Stafford |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
EXLOAN |
2B |
Nuneaton |
4w/e |
15/06/1957 |
ALLOC |
21B |
Bescot |
4w/e |
24/09/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
26/12/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1922 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2226 |
|
|
03/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9430 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49430 |
|
|
13/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2C) |
|
|
25/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
16/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (21B) |
|
|
26/12/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49430 |
|
|