Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 27 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4654 Week
» 6392 Month
» 133835 Year
» 1799211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2255 m/e 07/1922
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9431 m/e 05/1927
British Railways 49431 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Beames
Class G2
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
To Service During 07/1922
Withdrawal w/e Sat 01/12/1962
Service Life 40 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1922
3A   Bescot on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2A   Rugby 3w/e 11/12/1948
2A   Rugby w/e 18/12/1948
2F   Market Harborough 4w/e 05/11/1955
2D   Coventry 4w/e 25/01/1958
2B   Nuneaton w/e 15/11/1958
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 05/05/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 01/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 3A Bescot 4w/e 10/11/1945
ALLOC 2A Rugby w/e 18/12/1948
ALLOC 2F Market Harborough 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 2D Coventry 4w/e 25/01/1958
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 05/05/1962
WDN   w/e 01/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/03/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shops) Paint Shop: D90/5, 41247/50/5/7/9/64/82, 45228, 45658, 48686, 48733, L.N.W.R. 1054, and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D86/9/91-3, 44768, 48470. 48693, 49395, 84012. Works Sidings: 42584, 42678, 44665, 44868, 45101/90/8, 45205/64, 45391, 45500/4, 45612, 46101/64, 47271, 47672, 48101/22, 48437, 48628/57, 48734, 49149/73, 49335, 78030/4/64, 90313/43, 92009, 92159. Erecting Shops: D94/100-7, 41203/26, 42086, 42557/67, 42657/86, 44664/91, 44738/73, 44802/22/40, 44917, 45062/95, 45106/13/6/48/85, 45217/38/41/57, 45302/14/39/72/92, 45425/46, 45514, 45629/45/98, 45702/8, 46139/44, 46231, 47008, 48345, 48502, 48659, 49122, 49431, 70042, 71000, 90064, 90110, 90207/92, 90399, 90544/79/84, 92046/69. Outside Erecting Shops: 45000/15, 45533, 46421, 48895, 49328, 49448, 92135. New Erecting Shop: D96-9/108/9. Outside New Erecting Shop: D110. Scrap Road: 40001, 42397, 42438, 43194, 43333, 43562, 49243, with 45511 just cut-up. Leaving Works: 45341, 45613, 48705, 92087. Works Shunters: 12020, 44373/4, 47592, 47618, 51412/46, 52312, 52441/64. SLS/196104
07/05/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D100-2, 41254/65/73, 41325, 44872, 90173 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D103/5, 44837/43, 45565, 49395, 90582. Works Sidings: 41222, 42114, 42283, 42569, 43200, 43605, 44731/64, 44906, 45150, 45226/53, 45417, 45507/84, 46130, 46227/45, 46410/43, 47513, 47625, 48262, 48435, 48603, 48895, 49431, 70050, 78021, 90033, 92107. Erecting Shop: D110-6, 41246/64, 42110/54/60/86, 42285, 42557, 42618, 44750/62, 44834/9/91, 44932, 45078, 45142/82, 45238/74, 45300/97, 45441, 45514/21/45, 45613/28/44/64/95, 45701/2/10/36, 46127/50/7/70, 46246/7, 46487, 46501, 48171, 48317/54, 48430/74, 48511, 48672, 49094, 78031/62, 90214/99, 90315, 90530, 90712, 92020/49. Outside Erecting Shop: 42584, 44937, 45014, 45681, 48418/31/44, 90555, 92124. New Erecting Shop: D106-9/17-9. Scrap Road: 40204, 40589, 43515, 43729, 43948, 44072, 44357, 44480, 47626/37, 58221, with 47190 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 43957, 44363, 44552, 47592, 51412, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196106

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1922 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2255    
05/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9431    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49431    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
18/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Market Harborough (2F)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Coventry (2D)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
05/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
01/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 49431    

prev prev