Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 32 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4659 Week
» 6397 Month
» 133840 Year
» 1799216 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 895 m/e 08/1922
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9436 m/e 12/1926
British Railways 49436 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Beames
Class G2
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
To Service During 08/1922
Withdrawal w/e Sat 23/05/1959
Service Life 36 yrs, 9 mths , 22 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1922
2D   Nuneaton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 27/01/1951
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) m/e 31/01/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 23/05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) m/e 31/01/1951
WDN   w/e 23/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1922 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 895    
12/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9436    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49436    
27/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
23/05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 49436    

prev prev