Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 525 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3451 Week
» 5189 Month
» 132632 Year
» 1798008 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 36 m/e 09/1922
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9439 m/e 04/1926
British Railways 49439 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Beames
Class G2
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
To Service During 09/1922
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/12/1962
Service Life 40 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1922
2D   Nuneaton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9A   Longsight w/e 08/07/1950
24L   Carnforth w/e 18/04/1959
5B   Crewe South w/e 20/06/1959
1E   Bletchley w/e 17/09/1960
2B   Nuneaton w/e 12/11/1960
9D   Buxton (LNWR) w/e 06/01/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 08/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 9A Longsight w/e 08/07/1950
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 5w/e 02/05/1959
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 1E Bletchley 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 5w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 27/01/1962
WDN   w/e 08/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1922 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 36    
04/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9439    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 49439    
08/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
18/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
12/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
06/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
08/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 49439    

prev prev