Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 807 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18610 Week
» 71626 Month
» 191153 Year
» 3218006 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2383 |
m/e |
09/1922 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9443 |
m/e |
10/1926 |
British Railways |
49443 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 09/1922 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/10/1961 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1922 |
2B |
|
Bletchley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
1A |
Willesden |
5w/e |
02/03/1946 |
ALLOC |
1A |
Willesden |
4w/e |
30/03/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1922 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2383 |
|
|
10/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9443 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49443 |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49443 |
|
|