Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 4923 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20535 Week
» 119180 Month
» 321844 Year
» 3348697 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1329 |
m/e |
02/1912 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9155 |
m/e |
03/1927 |
British Railways |
49155 |
m/e |
02/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 02/1912 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 26/05/1962 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1912 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1329 |
|
|
03/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9155 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
09/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
02/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49155 |
|
|
28/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
27/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
27/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
26/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49155 |
|
|