Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1169 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14575 Week
» 67591 Month
» 187118 Year
» 3213971 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2385 |
m/e |
06/1912 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9181 |
m/e |
05/1927 |
British Railways |
49181 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 06/1912 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 04/04/1959 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 10 mths , 4 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2E |
Warwick |
w/e |
20/03/1948 |
ALLOC |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
14/01/1950 |
ALLOC |
2B |
Bletchley |
w/e |
03/06/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
04/04/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1912 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2385 |
|
|
05/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9181 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
20/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warwick (2E) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49181 |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
03/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
04/04/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49181 |
|
|