Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 23 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4650 Week
» 6388 Month
» 133831 Year
» 1799207 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2301 m/e 11/1912
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9191 m/e 11/1928
British Railways 49191 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Cooke
Class G1
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
G111/1912
G2A (0-8-0)11/1945
Wheels 0-8-0
To Service During 11/1912
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/10/1961
Service Life 48 yrs, 11 mths , 13 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1912
2D   Nuneaton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10B   Preston w/e 31/07/1948
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 15/11/1958
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 02/01/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 14/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10B Preston w/e 31/07/1948
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 02/01/1960
WDN   w/e 14/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1912 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2301    
11/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 9191    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49191    
31/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (10B)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
02/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
14/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 49191    

prev prev