Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 739 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14782 Week
» 79736 Month
» 282400 Year
» 3309253 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
351 |
m/e |
05/1914 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9237 |
m/e |
05/1927 |
British Railways |
49237 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 05/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 31/12/1949 off Edge Hill (8A) |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1914 |
2B |
|
Bletchley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
31/12/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
2B |
Bletchley |
w/e |
06/12/1947 |
EXLOAN |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
07/02/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
31/12/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1914 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 351 |
|
|
05/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9237 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 49237 but not taken up |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9237 from Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|