Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1040 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 4743 Week
» 3481 Month
» 417802 Year
» 1639367 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2379 m/e 05/1914
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9242 m/e 09/1926
British Railways 49242 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Cooke
Class G1
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
G105/1914
G2A02/1941
Wheels 0-8-0
To Service During 05/1914
Withdrawal During 05/1949
Service Life 35 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1914
8A Edge Hill on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 8A Edge Hill w/e 21/06/1947
ALLOC 4D Abergavenny w/e 21/08/1948
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction w/e 11/09/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1914 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2379    
09/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9242    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Edge Hill (8A)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 49242 but not taken up    
05/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 9242    

prev prev