Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1438 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19241 Week
» 72257 Month
» 191784 Year
» 3218637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2094 |
m/e |
08/1914 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9253 |
m/e |
08/1927 |
British Railways |
49253 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 08/1914 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 15/03/1952 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
w/e |
07/12/1946 |
ALLOC |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
06/12/1947 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1914 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2094 |
|
|
08/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9253 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 49253 but not taken up |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
15/03/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9253 |
|
|