Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3956 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17362 Week
» 70378 Month
» 189905 Year
» 3216758 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1167 |
m/e |
05/1916 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9260 |
m/e |
02/1926 |
British Railways |
49260 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 05/1916 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 30/04/1958 |
Service Life |
42 yrs |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/04/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/10/1945 |
Swansea Paxton Street MPD |
Home engines on shed on 17/10 were: 1676, 2360/81/90, 7715/41, 7807, 7931/3/41, 8325/44/5, 8673/89/91, 9033, 9260, 9358, 27621, 28543, 28622. Other locos were 2307, 5245, 5318, 8324, 8688, 9019 of 4A and 7258 of 4C. |
SLS/194601 |
31/01/1958 |
Shrewsbury MPD |
The following locomotives are in store here-43760, 49243/60/424 and WD's 90148/716. |
SLS/195803 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1916 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1167 |
|
|
02/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9260 |
|
|
02/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (4B) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49260 |
|
|
31/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
30/04/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49260 |
|
|