Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3513 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16919 Week
» 69935 Month
» 189462 Year
» 3216315 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2150 |
m/e |
03/1918 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9293 |
m/e |
08/1927 |
British Railways |
49293 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 03/1918 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/12/1962 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 9 mths , 2 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2E |
Warwick |
w/e |
23/09/1950 |
ALLOC |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5w/e |
05/05/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1918 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2150 |
|
|
08/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9293 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49293 |
|
|
23/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warwick (2E) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49293 |
|
|