Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 444 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5431 Week
» 13546 Month
» 140989 Year
» 1806365 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 894 m/e 07/1918
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9314 m/e 09/1926
British Railways 49314 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Cooke
Class G1
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
G107/1918
G2A (0-8-0)01/1947
Wheels 0-8-0
To Service During 07/1918
Withdrawal w/e Sat 01/12/1962
Service Life 44 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1918
11A   Carnforth on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
8A   Edge Hill 4w/e 01/12/1951
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 26/03/1955
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 05/05/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 01/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 11A Carnforth w/e 21/06/1947
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 05/05/1962
WDN   w/e 01/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/05/1962 Nuneaton MPD Nuneaton's last LNW 0-8-0 49314 (transferred to Springs Branch) was under repair at Rugby on 19th May. SLS/196207
10/03/1963 Preston MPD (Stored) Stored at Preston on 10th March-42476/661, 45543/50, 49104/314/81/402/8/38/47/51. SLS/196304
01/04/1963 Midland Miscellany (Stored) The new Water Orton station junction box-renamed Water Orton East Junction-was brought into use 12th May, 1963. Ketley Junc. was removed 12th May, 1963; it is now only possible to approach Ketley station via Lightmoor Junction. On 12th May, the collapse of Black Bridge (over the course of the old River Nene) at Stanground, Peterborough, closed the Peterborough East-March section and buses are now operating between Peterborough and Whittlesey.
It is understood that the Ashbourne-Buxton line will not be available for passenger trains after Sunday, 26th May, when excursions ran from Hinckley to Tissington and Buxton, Alsager to Tissington and Buxton, Colne to Buxton and Ashbourne and Manchester (P) to Buxton and Ashbourne. The Atherton Junc. (Bag Lane)-Pennington South Junc. section of the former LNWR Kenyon Junc.-Bolton Gt. Moor St. branch is to be officially closed w.e.f. 17th June, 1963.
SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1918 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 894    
09/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9314    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carnforth (11A)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49314    
01/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
05/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
01/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 49314    

prev prev